AZ SB1072 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 329
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 329
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative decisions; scope of review
Title
Administrative decisions; scope of review
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 21 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-13 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (RET ON CAL) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Judiciary and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-26 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Senate | Chapter 329 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (16-13-1-0) |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-05-09 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (34-21-5-0) |
2017-05-09 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-04-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-04-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2017-03-28 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-28 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-27 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-15 | House | House JPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Assigned to House JPS Committee |
2017-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-13-0-0) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-1-0) |
2017-01-18 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2017-01-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 348 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
12 | 910 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |