AZ SB1092 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 93
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Chapter 93
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Rulemaking; exemption; AZPOST
Title
Rulemaking; exemption; AZPOST
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 11 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-28 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-23 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-16 | Senate | Chapter 93 |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2019-04-10 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2019-04-09 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-04-09 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (46-11-3-0) |
2019-03-21 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-03-12 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-12 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2019-03-11 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-06 | House | House PS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | House | House read second time |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Assigned to House PS Committee |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Senate TPS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2019-01-17 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |