AZ SB1103 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Chapter 257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Chapter 257
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Pharmacy board; authority; modifications
Title
Pharmacy board; authority; modifications
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-20 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 56 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-07 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | Senate | Chapter 257 |
2019-05-25 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2019-05-20 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-05-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (56-0-4-0) |
2019-05-07 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-14 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-12 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-11 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2019-03-11 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-03-04 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-0-0) |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona State Board Of Pharmacy
Authority
Modification
Pharmacy Board
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Authority
Modification
Pharmacy Board
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1904 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1921.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1940 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1961 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1968 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1971 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1977 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 3248.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2525 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |