AZ SB1137 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Pharmacy board; permittee operations; fees
Title
Pharmacy board; permittee operations; fees
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Pace [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-03 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-29 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-10 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-1-0) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona State Board Of Pharmacy
Fees
Fingerprint Clearance Cards
Permittee Operations
Pharmacy Board
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Repeal
State Government - Title 41
Fees
Fingerprint Clearance Cards
Permittee Operations
Pharmacy Board
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Repeal
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1901 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1901.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1924 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1930 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1931 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1941 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1982 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2604 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1758 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1758.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 619.51 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |