AZ SB1142 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Nonhealth professions; occupations; regulations.
Title
Nonhealth professions; occupations; regulations.
Sponsors
Sen. Tyler Pace [R] | Sen. Anthony Kern [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 18 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-06 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-05 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2020-03-04 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-03-02 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (18-11-1-0) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-0) |
2020-01-21 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2020-01-16 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Committee Of Reference
Definitions
Nonhealth Professions
Occupations
Regulation
Repeal
State Government - Title 41
Transferring And Renumbering
Written Report
Definitions
Nonhealth Professions
Occupations
Regulation
Repeal
State Government - Title 41
Transferring And Renumbering
Written Report
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 2954 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3501 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3502 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3503 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3506 | New Code | See Bill Text |