AZ SB1150 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 331
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Ignition interlock device; regulation; installers
Title
Ignition interlock device; regulation; installers
Sponsors
Sen. Bob Worsley [R] | Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. Karen Fann [R] |
Sen. Catherine Miranda [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-08 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 32 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - House Transportation and Infrastructure Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Technology Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Senate | Chapter 331 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-05-08 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (32-28-0-0) |
2017-04-27 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2017-04-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-04-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-03-15 | House | House TI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-03-07 | House | House read second time |
2017-03-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Assigned to House TI Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2017-01-31 | Senate | Senate TRANSIT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TRANSIT Committee |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adot
Application
Contract Requirements
Department Of Transportation
Funds
Ignition Interlock Devices
Ignition Interlock Fund
Installers
Regulation
Transportation
Application
Contract Requirements
Department Of Transportation
Funds
Ignition Interlock Devices
Ignition Interlock Fund
Installers
Regulation
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 1301 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1441 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1462 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1463 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1464 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1465 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1467 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1468 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 1469 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 4848 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |