AZ SB1154 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Technical correction; estates
Title
Technical correction; estates
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Governor Vetoed | |
2010-04-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-29 | Senate final reading , voting: (26-2-2-0) | |
2010-04-29 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-29 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-29 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-28 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-28 | House third reading , voting: (50-9-1-0) | |
2010-04-28 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-04-27 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-27 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-26 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-04-01 | House NRRA Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-1-0-0-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Referred to House NRRA Committee | |
2010-03-31 | House read second time | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to House NRRA Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-18 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-18 | Senate third reading , voting: (25-4-1-0) | |
2010-03-15 | Senate Consent Calendar March 15, 2010 @ 1:37 PM | |
2010-03-16 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-16 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-15 | Senate RULES Committee action: Do pass and proper for consideration, voting: (3-1-2-0) | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-20 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-20 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |