AZ SB1161 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Chapter 247
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-22 - Chapter 247
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School facilities; revisions
Title
School facilities; revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 9 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-14 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 46 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 10 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-22 | Senate | Chapter 247 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (17-9-4-0) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-05-14 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (46-14-0-0) |
2019-05-09 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-01 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-26 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-25 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (10-3-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-03-06 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-11-0-0) |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-3-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 119 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 189 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 2002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 341 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 342 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 342.04 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 491 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5018 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |