AZ SB1176 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-16 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Apartment referrals; finder fee
Title
Apartment referrals; finder fee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-16 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-12 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-09 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-08 | House third reading , voting: (36-19-5-0) | |
2010-04-08 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-04-06 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-29 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-2-0) | |
2010-03-02 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-17 | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) | |
2010-03-03 | Referred to House COM Committee | |
2010-03-03 | House read second time | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Assigned to House COM Committee | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-02-15 | Transmit to House | |
2010-02-15 | Senate third reading , voting: (26-4-0-0) | |
2010-02-11 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-02-09 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-09 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-08 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-21 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Senate CED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-1-0) | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-21 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Assigned to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-01-21 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |