AZ SB1179 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Chapter 242
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Chapter 242
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Constables; prohibited acts
Title
Constables; prohibited acts
Sponsors
Rep. Judy Burges [R] |
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 52 N: 2 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Chapter 242 | |
2014-04-30 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-23 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (52-2-6-0) |
2014-04-01 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-03-18 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-18 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2014-02-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-27 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2014-02-26 | House | Referred to House JUD Committee |
2014-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2014-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-02-25 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2014-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-03 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2014-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |