AZ SB1181 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Chapter 236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Chapter 236
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
DOR; collection statement; delivery deadline
Title
DOR; collection statement; delivery deadline
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-14 | Senate | Chapter 236 |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-05-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2019-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-18 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-13 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-2-0-0) |
2019-01-29 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2019-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |