AZ SB1189 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 10 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-10 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Admissibility of expert opinion testimony...
Title
Admissibility of expert opinion testimony...
Sponsors
Sen. Carolyn Allen [R] | Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Rep. Steve Court [R] | Sen. Barbara Leff [R] |
Sen. Albert Melvin [R] | Rep. Eric Meyer [D] | Rep. Andy Tobin [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-10 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | Senate final reading , voting: (22-8-0-0) | |
2010-04-28 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2010-04-28 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-28 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-19 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-19 | House third reading , voting: (40-15-5-0) | |
2010-04-08 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2010-04-06 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-06 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-05 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-1-0-3-0) | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-31 | House JUD Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-03-18 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2010-03-24 | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-3-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-22 | Referred to House HHS Committee | |
2010-03-22 | House read second time | |
2010-03-18 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-18 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2010-03-18 | Assigned to House HHS Committee | |
2010-03-18 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-01 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-01 | Senate third reading , voting: (20-8-1-0) | |
2010-02-15 | Senate Consent Calendar February 15, 2010 @ 2:25 PM | |
2010-02-16 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-16 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-02-15 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Senate CED Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2010-01-25 | Referred to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-02-10 | Senate HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0) | |
2010-01-26 | Referred to Senate HEALTH Committee | |
2010-01-26 | Senate read second time | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Assigned to Senate CED Committee | |
2010-02-01 | Assigned to Senate HEALTH Committee | |
2010-01-25 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |