AZ SB1200 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Ignition interlock device; time requirements
Title
Ignition interlock device; time requirements
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Biggs [R] | Sen. Ron Gould [R] | Sen. Linda Gray [R] | Rep. Stephen Pierce [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 51 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 5 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-08 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-26 - Senate - Senate Public Safety and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Senate final reading , voting: (27-3-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-18 | House third reading , voting: (51-7-2-0) | |
2011-04-14 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-11 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (5-1-1-2-0) | |
2011-02-15 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-24 | House TRANS Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-02-16 | House read second time | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Assigned to House TRANS Committee | |
2011-02-15 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-02-08 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-08 | Senate third reading , voting: (24-5-1-0) | |
2011-02-03 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2011-01-31 | Senate Consent Calendar January 31, 2011 @ 2:15 PM with Objections | |
2011-02-01 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-01 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-01-31 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-26 | Senate PSHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-1-0) | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-01-25 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to Senate PSHS Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |