AZ SB1201 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Firearms omnibus
Title
Firearms omnibus
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] | Rep. Judy Burges [R] | Sen. Chester Crandell [R] | Sen. Ron Gould [R] |
Sen. David Gowan [R] | Rep. Jack Harper [R] | Rep. Peggy Judd [R] | Sen. Javan Mesnard [R] |
Sen. Rick Murphy [R] | Sen. John Nelson [R] | Sen. Russell Pearce [R] | Rep. Carl Seel [R] |
Rep. David Smith [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 16 N: 38 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 6 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 38 N: 20 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - House - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 16 N: 38 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-04 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - Senate - Senate - COW Motion to Amend (Y: 6 N: 20 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor Vetoed | |
2011-04-15 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-14 | Senate final reading , voting: (21-8-1-0) | |
2011-04-14 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-14 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-14 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-14 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-13 | House third reading , voting: (38-20-2-0) | |
2011-04-13 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-04 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-14 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-24 | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-4-0-0-0) | |
2011-03-15 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-15 | House read second time | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-14 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-04 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-03 | Senate third reading , voting: (21-8-1-0) | |
2011-03-02 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-01 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-01 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-28 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2011-01-24 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-2-0-0) | |
2011-01-25 | Referred to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-01-25 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee | |
2011-01-24 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |