AZ SB1205 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - House read second time
Pending: House Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-09 - House read second time
Pending: House Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
State personnel board; hearings
Title
State personnel board; hearings
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2020-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Power Authority
Hearings
Power - Title 30
Public Employees
Public Officers
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Revenue Bond Authority
State Government - Title 41
State Personnel Board
Strike Everything Amendment
Technical Correction
Hearings
Power - Title 30
Public Employees
Public Officers
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Revenue Bond Authority
State Government - Title 41
State Personnel Board
Strike Everything Amendment
Technical Correction