AZ SB1226 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-21 - House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Notarial act; revised uniform law
Title
Notarial act; revised uniform law
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] | Sen. Rick Gray [R] | Sen. Vince Leach [R] | Rep. Franklin Pratt [R] |
Sen. John Kavanagh [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-21 - House - House Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-21 | House | House GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-03-05 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate COM Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate COM Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Bond
Certificates
Corporations And Associations - Title 10
County Residency Status
Course Of Study
Court Reporters
Database
Definitions
Duties
Education - Title 15
Effective Date
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Electronic Signatures
National Commerce Act
Notarial Act
Notarial Officer
Notaries Public
Notary Education Fund
Prohibited Acts
Property - Title 33
Qualifications
Repeal
Requirements For Enactment
Revised Uniform Law
Rules
State Government - Title 41
Strike Everything Amendment
Three-fourths Vote
Trade And Commerce - Title 44
Certificates
Corporations And Associations - Title 10
County Residency Status
Course Of Study
Court Reporters
Database
Definitions
Duties
Education - Title 15
Effective Date
Elections And Electors - Title 16
Electronic Signatures
National Commerce Act
Notarial Act
Notarial Officer
Notaries Public
Notary Education Fund
Prohibited Acts
Property - Title 33
Qualifications
Repeal
Requirements For Enactment
Revised Uniform Law
Rules
State Government - Title 41
Strike Everything Amendment
Three-fourths Vote
Trade And Commerce - Title 44
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 1802.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 946 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 251 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 252 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 253 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 254 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 255 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 256 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 257 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 258 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 259 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 260 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 261 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 262 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 263 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 264 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 265 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 266 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 267 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 268 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 269 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 270 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 271 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 272 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 273 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 274 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 275 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 313 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 319 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 328 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 330 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 371 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 376 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |