AZ SB1227 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0)
Pending: House Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Dental hygienists; affiliated practice
Title
Dental hygienists; affiliated practice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-1-0-0) |
2020-03-03 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-02 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-03-02 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2020-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Affiliated Practice
Definitions
Dental Hygienists
Practices
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Requirements
Rules
State Board Of Dental Examiners
Supervision
Definitions
Dental Hygienists
Practices
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Requirements
Rules
State Board Of Dental Examiners
Supervision
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 1281 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 1289.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |