AZ SB1273 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-16 - Chapter 337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Administrative proceedings; rules; contested cases
Title
Administrative proceedings; rules; contested cases
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-18 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-04 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2018-04-04 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2018-03-19 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 19 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-07 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-16 | Senate | Chapter 337 |
2018-05-16 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (21-9-0-0) |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2018-04-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2018-04-18 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-04-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-27-0-0) |
2018-04-18 | House | House additional Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-04-04 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2018-04-04 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (27-32-1-0) |
2018-04-04 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-03-27 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-27 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-03-26 | House | House consent calendar |
2018-03-26 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (6-0-0-3-0-0) |
2018-03-19 | House | House MVRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-4-0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | Assigned to House MVRA Committee |
2018-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-03-01 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (19-11-0-0) |
2018-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-02-07 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2018-01-24 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 1033 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |