AZ SB1283 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 13 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriation; emergency shelter beds; seniors
Title
Appropriation; emergency shelter beds; seniors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-13 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |