AZ SB1291 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 207
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Chapter 207
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibited weapons; nunchaku; repeal
Title
Prohibited weapons; nunchaku; repeal
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-02 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 24 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-11 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Chapter 207 |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-05-02 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (42-17-1-0) |
2019-04-15 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2019-04-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-27 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-07 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-06 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2019-03-06 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-18 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (24-5-1-0) |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
13 | 3101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |