AZ SB1292 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Misconduct involving weapons; classification
Title
Misconduct involving weapons; classification
Sponsors
Sen. David Gowan [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-11 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Senate JUD Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate JUD Committee |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |