AZ SB1317 | 2017 | Fifty-third Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Chapter 337
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Schools; specially designed instruction
Title
Schools; specially designed instruction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 3 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - Senate - Senate Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-22 | Senate | Chapter 337 |
2017-05-22 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-05-09 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (55-0-5-0) |
2017-04-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (27-0-3-0) |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Senate Conference adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | House Conference adopted |
2017-04-26 | House | House Conference caucus date |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conference caucus date |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conference report: That the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Senate Conference members: BRADLEY has been replaced by OTONDO |
2017-04-11 | House | House Conference members: BOYER, COLEMAN, FRIESE |
2017-04-11 | House | House Conference appointed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Conference members: ALLEN S, BROPHY MCGEE, OTONDO |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Conference appointed |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2017-03-16 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-3-4-0) |
2017-03-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2017-03-14 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-14 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-03-13 | House | House consent calendar |
2017-03-13 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-27 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-1-0-0) |
2017-02-21 | House | House read second time |
2017-02-20 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2017-02-20 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2017-02-14 | House | Transmit to House |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2017-01-26 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
15 | 761 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 763 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |