AZ SB1332 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; PSPRS; EORP; unfunded liabilities
Title
Appropriations; PSPRS; EORP; unfunded liabilities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House GOV Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-2-0-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-2-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations
Department Of Public Safety
Elected Officials' Retirement Plan
Eorp
Offset Unfunded Pension Liability
Psprs
Public Safety Personnel Retirement System
Unfunded Liabilities
Appropriations
Department Of Public Safety
Elected Officials' Retirement Plan
Eorp
Offset Unfunded Pension Liability
Psprs
Public Safety Personnel Retirement System
Unfunded Liabilities