AZ SB1333 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Senate motion to reconsider third reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Peace officer rights; due process
Title
Peace officer rights; due process
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 12 N: 17 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate motion to reconsider third reading |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate third reading FAILED voting: (12-17-1-0) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate TPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-3-0) |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2020-01-28 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Appeals
Burden Of Proof
Definitions
Disciplinary Action
Due Process
Employee Representative
Examinations
Exceptions
Fitness For Duty
Internal Investigations
Law Enforcement Officers
Peace Officer Rights
Polygraph Examination
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Right To Representation
Rights Of Officers
Time Limitation
Transcripts
Witness Testimony
Burden Of Proof
Definitions
Disciplinary Action
Due Process
Employee Representative
Examinations
Exceptions
Fitness For Duty
Internal Investigations
Law Enforcement Officers
Peace Officer Rights
Polygraph Examination
Public Officers And Employees - Title 38
Right To Representation
Rights Of Officers
Time Limitation
Transcripts
Witness Testimony
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
38 | 1104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 1105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 1106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 1110 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
38 | 1112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |