AZ SB1334 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Hunting within city limits
Title
Hunting within city limits
Sponsors
Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Sen. Frank Antenori [R] | Sen. Andy Biggs [R] | Sen. Ron Gould [R] |
Sen. David Gowan [R] | Sen. Lori Klein [R] | Rep. Steve Montenegro [R] | Sen. John Nelson [R] |
Sen. Steve Smith [R] | Rep. David Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP ON RECON) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-28 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DP ON RECON) (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-07 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Transportation Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor Signed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Senate final reading , voting: (21-9-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-18 | House third reading , voting: (41-17-2-0) | |
2011-04-07 | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar | |
2011-03-28 | House Consent Calendar March 28, 2011 @ 3:07 PM with Objections | |
2011-04-05 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-05 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-28 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-08 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-17 | House JUD Committee action: Do pass on reconsideration, voting: (6-2-0-1-0) | |
2011-03-09 | Referred to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-09 | House read second time | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Assigned to House JUD Committee | |
2011-03-08 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-01 | Transmit to House | |
2011-02-28 | Senate third reading , voting: (20-9-1-0) | |
2011-02-24 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-02-23 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-23 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-02-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-07 | Senate NRT Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-2-0-0) | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Senate read second time | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Assigned to Senate NRT Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |