AZ SB1334 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on June 7 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-07 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Sentencing; repetitive offenders
Title
Sentencing; repetitive offenders
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-27 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 59 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-09 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DPA/SE) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-07 | Governor Vetoed | |
2019-05-27 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-05-27 | House | House final reading PASSED, voting: (59-0-1-0) |
2019-05-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (26-3-1-0) |
2019-05-27 | Senate | Senate Conference adopted |
2019-05-27 | House | House Conference adopted |
2019-05-27 | House | House Conference caucus date |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate Conference caucus date |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Senate Conference report: That the Senate accept the House amendments with exceptions and the bill be further amended. |
2019-05-23 | House | House Conference members: TOMA, BLACKMAN, ENGEL |
2019-05-23 | House | House Conference appointed |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Conference members: MESNARD, FARNSWORTH E. (12), QUEZADA |
2019-05-21 | Senate | Senate Conference appointed |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2019-05-09 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-05-09 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (42-16-2-0) |
2019-05-09 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-04-30 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-30 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-25 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0-0) |
2019-04-03 | House | House APPROP Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (10-1-0-0-0-0) |
2019-04-01 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-04-01 | House | House WM Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-0-0-0) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Conditional Enactment
Deduction
Excise Tax
Independent Functional Utility
Legislative Intent
Retroactivity
Taxation - Title 42
Transaction Privilege Tax
Deduction
Excise Tax
Independent Functional Utility
Legislative Intent
Retroactivity
Taxation - Title 42
Transaction Privilege Tax
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
12 | 2703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 3419 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 701 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
13 | 703 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1604.10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 5075 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 6004 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |