AZ SB1340 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Chapter 119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-22 - Chapter 119
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
ABOR; university scholarships; report
Title
ABOR; university scholarships; report
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-16 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 60 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-11 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | Senate | Chapter 119 |
2019-04-22 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate final reading PASSED, voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-04-11 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (60-0-0-0) |
2019-04-11 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-03-19 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-19 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-18 | House | House Committee of the Whole consent calendar |
2019-03-18 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-11 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-06 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2019-03-05 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Senate HEWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HEWD Committee |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |