AZ SB1342 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Apprentice embalmers; removal
Title
Apprentice embalmers; removal
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Driggs [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-10 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-21 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-20 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Governor Signed | |
2013-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (28-1-1-0) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-06-11 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-06-10 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2013-05-30 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Retained on the Calendar |
2013-05-22 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-05-22 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-05-21 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-05-14 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Withdrawn |
2013-02-25 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2013-03-20 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2013-02-26 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2013-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2013-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-18 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Senate CEM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate CEM Committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CEM Committee |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |