AZ SB1353 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-1-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-03 - House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-1-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
AHCCCS services; diabetes management
Title
AHCCCS services; diabetes management
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-03 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-26 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-03 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (10-1-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-28 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2019-03-07 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-1-0-0) |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Ahcccs
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Diabetes
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Services
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Diabetes
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Services