AZ SB1353 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-20 - House minority caucus: Do pass
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
ADOT revisions
Title
ADOT revisions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - House - House Transportation Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Transportation and Public Safety Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-05-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-05-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-04 | House | House TRANS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-27 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Assigned to House TRANS Committee |
2020-02-27 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-2-1-0) |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate TPS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate TPS Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Adot
Arizona Highways Magazine
Conditional Enactment
Department Of Transportation
Personal Information
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Revisions
Sex Trafficking
Towing Reimbursement
Transportation - Title 28
Arizona Highways Magazine
Conditional Enactment
Department Of Transportation
Personal Information
Professions And Occupations - Title 32
Revisions
Sex Trafficking
Towing Reimbursement
Transportation - Title 28
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 1150 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 2098 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3225 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 3312 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 364 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 365 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 455 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 456 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 4805 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 7143 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 7314 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 7315 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 8325 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
32 | 2351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |