AZ SB1366 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-1-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-1-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Commerce authority; data centers
Title
Commerce authority; data centers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Ways & Means Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | House WM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-3-0-1-0-0) |
2019-03-25 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2019-03-21 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (16-14-0-0) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-3-0-0) |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Arizona Commerce Authority
Commerce Authority
Data Center
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Taxation - Title 42
Commerce Authority
Data Center
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Taxation - Title 42