AZ SB1397 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Chapter 253
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Liquor omnibus
Title
Liquor omnibus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-18 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Commerce, Energy and Military Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Chapter 253 | |
2014-04-30 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (27-1-2-0) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate Concurrence PASSED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-23 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-0-7-0) |
2014-04-16 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-04-01 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-01 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-03-18 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (4-1-0-4-0) |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2014-03-10 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-03-06 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0) |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate CEM Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CEM Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |