AZ SB1398 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 26-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Tax omnibus
Title
Tax omnibus
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 17 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-05 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-19 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (17-12-1-0) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-1-0) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Delayed Repeal
Education - Title 15
Effective Date
Electric Vehicles
Hybrid Electric Vehicles
Retroactivity
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
State Government - Title 41
Tax Omnibus
Taxation
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Transportation - Title 28
Education - Title 15
Effective Date
Electric Vehicles
Hybrid Electric Vehicles
Retroactivity
Special Taxing Districts - Title 48
State Government - Title 41
Tax Omnibus
Taxation
Taxation - Title 42
Taxation Of Income - Title 43
Transportation - Title 28
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
28 | 2007 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 5606 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
28 | 5606.01 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1276 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1544 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1752 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 1124 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
42 | 15001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1022 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1024 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1073.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1127 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
43 | 1130.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |