AZ SB1401 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Trade names; trademarks; application
Title
Trade names; trademarks; application
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-14 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-09 - House - House Commerce Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-15 - Senate - Senate Commerce and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | Governor Vetoed | |
2016-05-09 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-05-07 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-05-07 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (53-1-6-0) |
2016-03-15 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-15 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-14 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-09 | House | House COM Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2016-03-02 | House | Referred to House COM Committee |
2016-03-02 | House | House read second time |
2016-03-01 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | Assigned to House COM Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-2-2-0) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate CWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-1-2-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate CWD Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |