AZ SB1408 | 2014 | Fifty-first Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Chapter 254
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-30 - Chapter 254
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Money transmitters; money laundering; definitions
Title
Money transmitters; money laundering; definitions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-23 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House Financial Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2014-03-17 - House - House Financial Institutions Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-30 | Chapter 254 | |
2014-04-30 | Governor Signed | |
2014-04-24 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2014-04-23 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2014-04-23 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (55-0-5-0) |
2014-04-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-04-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-04-02 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-17 | House | House FI Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0-0) |
2014-03-11 | House | Referred to House FI Committee |
2014-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2014-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | Assigned to House FI Committee |
2014-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2014-02-28 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2014-02-26 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-19 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-0-2-0) |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Referred to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2014-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |