AZ SB1411 | 2010 | Forty-ninth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-11 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Animal identification systems; participation
Title
Animal identification systems; participation
Sponsors
Sen. John Nelson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-11 | Governor Signed | |
2010-04-29 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-04-28 | Transmit to Senate | |
2010-04-28 | House third reading , voting: (31-27-2-0) | |
2010-04-28 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass | |
2010-04-27 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-27 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-04-19 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-30 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2010-04-08 | House NRRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-1-0-1-0) | |
2010-03-31 | Referred to House NRRA Committee | |
2010-03-31 | House read second time | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Assigned to House NRRA Committee | |
2010-03-30 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2010-03-22 | Transmit to House | |
2010-03-22 | Senate third reading , voting: (22-7-1-0) | |
2010-03-18 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2010-03-02 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-02 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2010-03-01 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-22 | Senate NRIPD Committee action: do pass amended/strike-everything, voting: (5-0-2-0) | |
2010-02-04 | Referred to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Senate read second time | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2010-02-04 | Assigned to Senate NRIPD Committee | |
2010-02-02 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |