AZ SB1420 | 2018 | Fifty-third Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Senate concurs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-03 - Senate concurs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Medical marijuana; inspection; testing; appropriation
Title
Medical marijuana; inspection; testing; appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-03 - Senate - Senate - Concurrence (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Reconsider Third Reading (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-03 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-02 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2018-03-14 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-12 - House - House Military, Veterans and Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 27 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-12 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-31 - Senate - Senate Government Committee Action (DP) (Y: 4 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate concurs |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Conference |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Senate Conference Committee recommended |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2018-05-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (36-24-0-0) |
2018-05-03 | House | House motion to reconsider third reading |
2018-05-03 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (33-27-0-0) |
2018-05-03 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-05-02 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-05-02 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-05-02 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0-0) |
2018-03-21 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (13-0-0-0-0-0) |
2018-03-12 | House | House MVRA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-1-0-1-0-0) |
2018-03-01 | House | House read second time |
2018-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Assigned to House MVRA Committee |
2018-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2018-02-22 | House | Transmit to House |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (27-3-0-0) |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2018-02-12 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2018-01-31 | Senate | Senate GOV Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (4-3-0-0) |
2018-01-30 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Assigned to Senate GOV Committee |
2018-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Agricultural Commodity
Agriculture - Title 3
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations
Arizona Department Of Agriculture
Certification
Emergency
Inspections
Laboratories
Medical Marijuana
Medical Marijuana Fund
Medical Marijuana Reform Act
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Rfeir
Testing
Agriculture - Title 3
Appropriating Monies
Appropriations
Arizona Department Of Agriculture
Certification
Emergency
Inspections
Laboratories
Medical Marijuana
Medical Marijuana Fund
Medical Marijuana Reform Act
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Rfeir
Testing
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3 | 109.03 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 145 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 201 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 231 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
3 | 364 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2803 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2804.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2804.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 2806 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |