AZ SB1443 | 2016 | Fifty-second Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on May 18 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-18 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Health profession regulatory boards
Title
Health profession regulatory boards
Sponsors
Sen. Nancy Barto [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-07 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 55 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-18 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-24 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-10 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-18 | Governor Vetoed | |
2016-05-09 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-19 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-04-18 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2016-04-18 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-0-3-0) |
2016-03-29 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-03-24 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-03-24 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-1-0) |
2016-02-29 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2016-03-15 | House | House HEALTH Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (5-0-0-1-0) |
2016-03-01 | House | Referred to House HEALTH Committee |
2016-03-01 | House | House read second time |
2016-02-29 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2016-02-29 | House | Assigned to House HEALTH Committee |
2016-02-29 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2016-02-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (28-0-2-0) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Referred to Senate HHS Committee |
2016-02-02 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2016-02-01 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |