AZ SB1450 | 2013 | Fifty-first Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-06-20 - Governor Signed
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
School districts; FERPA violations; penalty
Title
School districts; FERPA violations; penalty
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-06-14 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 34 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-13 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 21 N: 37 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-30 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-03-18 - House - House Education Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - Senate - Senate Education Accountability and Reform Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Governor Signed | |
2013-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2013-06-14 | Senate | Senate final reading , voting: (23-6-1-0) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate Concurrence FAILED, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-06-13 | House | Transmit to Senate |
2013-06-13 | House | House third reading FAILED voting: (21-37-2-0) |
2013-06-13 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2013-04-30 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-30 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-04-30 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) |
2013-02-28 | House | Referred to House RULES Committee |
2013-03-18 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-3-0-0-0) |
2013-03-04 | House | Referred to House ED Committee |
2013-03-04 | House | House read second time |
2013-02-28 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2013-02-28 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Transmit to House |
2013-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-02-14 | Senate | Senate ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-1-0) |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Referred to Senate ED Committee |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2013-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate ED Committee |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |