AZ SB1457 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
DOR; e-commerce compliance office
Title
DOR; e-commerce compliance office
Sponsors
Sen. Vince Leach [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 25 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House WM Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (25-5-0-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-1-1-0) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |