AZ SB1472 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-11 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
AHCCCS; postpartum visits; incentive payments
Title
AHCCCS; postpartum visits; incentive payments
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-03-09 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-4-0-0) |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-1-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Ahcccs
Appropriating Monies
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Incentives
Postpartum
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Appropriating Monies
Arizona Health Care Cost Containment System
Incentives
Postpartum
Public Health And Safety - Title 36