AZ SB1473 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - House read second time
Pending: House Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona nurses academy
Title
Arizona nurses academy
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-25 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFCA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-11 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-25 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (29-0-1-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration Amended, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Annual Report
Arizona Nurses Academy
Board Of Regents
Community Colleges
Education - Title 15
Fund
Postsecondary Institutions
Scholarships
Tuition And Fees
Universities
Arizona Nurses Academy
Board Of Regents
Community Colleges
Education - Title 15
Fund
Postsecondary Institutions
Scholarships
Tuition And Fees
Universities