AZ SB1475 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Senate NRE Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-19 - Senate NRE Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0)
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Aquifer protection permits; injection wells
Title
Aquifer protection permits; injection wells
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate NRE Committee action: Held, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRE Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
49 | 250 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
49 | 257.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |