AZ SB1476 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - House RULES Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-17 - House RULES Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Archaeology advisory commission; duties; continuation
Title
Archaeology advisory commission; duties; continuation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - House - House Rules Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - House - House Natural Resources, Energy & Water Committee Action (W/D) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Natural Resources and Energy Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | House | House RULES Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-17 | House | House NREW Committee action: Withdrawn, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House NREW Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-0-4-0) |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate NRE Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate NRE Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Archaeology Advisory Commission
Continuation
Duties
Purpose
Repeal
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Continuation
Duties
Purpose
Repeal
Retroactivity
State Government - Title 41
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
41 | 3020.12 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 3023.16 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 847 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |