AZ SB1483 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Chapter 221
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Chapter 221
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Vulnerable adults; financial exploitation
Title
Vulnerable adults; financial exploitation
Sponsors
Sen. Javan Mesnard [R] | Sen. Lela Alston [D] | Sen. Sean Bowie [D] | Rep. Heather Carter [R] |
Sen. Sine Kerr [R] | Rep. David Livingston [R] | Rep. Aaron Lieberman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-06 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-08 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - House - House Health & Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (RETAINED) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | Senate | Chapter 221 |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-05-06 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2019-05-06 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-0-2-0) |
2019-04-09 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-09 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-04-08 | House | House consent calendar |
2019-04-08 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (7-1-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-21 | House | House HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to House HHS Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-03-07 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-4-0-0) |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Retained |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |