AZ SB1492 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Chapter 85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Chapter 85
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Arizona teachers academy; program pathways
Title
Arizona teachers academy; program pathways
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Boyer [R] | Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Rep. Heather Carter [R] | Sen. Sine Kerr [R] |
Sen. Tony Navarrete [D] | Rep. Michelle Udall [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-05-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 58 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-19 - House - House Education Committee Action (DP) (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Higher Education and Workforce Development Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | Senate | Chapter 85 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-05-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (58-2-0-0) |
2020-05-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-05-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-05-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-05-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-05-19 | House | House ED Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (11-0-0-2-0-0) |
2020-03-11 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Assigned to House ED Committee |
2020-03-10 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-0-4-0) |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Senate HEWD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HEWD Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |