AZ SB1497 | 2011 | Fiftieth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on April 29 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-29 - Governor Vetoed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Joint powers exercise; separate entities
Title
Joint powers exercise; separate entities
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-19 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Higher Education, Innovation and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 48 N: 11 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-12 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-24 - House - House Higher Education, Innovation and Reform Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-21 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 10 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-23 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-29 | Governor Vetoed | |
2011-04-20 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-04-19 | Senate final reading , voting: (22-8-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate Concurrence , voting: (0-0-0-0) | |
2011-04-19 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-19 | Transmit to Senate | |
2011-04-19 | House third reading , voting: (48-11-1-0) | |
2011-04-18 | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-04-12 | House majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-04-12 | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (4-0-1-4-0) | |
2011-03-22 | Referred to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-24 | House HEIR Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (7-0-0-2-0) | |
2011-03-23 | Referred to House HEIR Committee | |
2011-03-23 | House read second time | |
2011-03-22 | Assigned to House RULES Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Assigned to House HEIR Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Introduced in House and read first time | |
2011-03-21 | Transmit to House | |
2011-03-21 | Senate third reading , voting: (16-10-4-0) | |
2011-03-15 | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended | |
2011-03-15 | Senate majority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-15 | Senate minority caucus: Do pass | |
2011-03-14 | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration | |
2011-02-01 | Referred to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-23 | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-4-0-0) | |
2011-02-21 | Referred to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Senate GR Committee action: Withdrawn | |
2011-02-02 | Referred to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-02-02 | Senate read second time | |
2011-02-01 | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee | |
2011-02-21 | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Assigned to Senate GR Committee | |
2011-02-01 | Introduced in Senate and read first time |