AZ SB1504 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Chapter 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Chapter 86
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Fingerprinting; vital records; child care
Title
Fingerprinting; vital records; child care
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-20 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 57 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House - Committee of the Whole (DP) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-20 - House - House Public Safety Committee Action (DP) (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-27 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate Health and Human Services Committee Action (DP) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | Senate | Chapter 86 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-05-20 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-05-20 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (57-3-0-0) |
2020-05-20 | House | House Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass |
2020-05-20 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-05-20 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-05-20 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-05-20 | House | House PS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (6-0-1-0-0-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | House read second time |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Assigned to House PS Committee |
2020-03-09 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-27 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (30-0-0-0) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate HHS Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (8-0-0-0) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Assigned to Senate HHS Committee |
2020-02-03 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Accounts
Background Check Requirements
Central State Repository
Child Care
Child Care Group Homes
Child Care Personnel
Child Care Providers
Day Care Homes
Definitions
Department Of Economic Security
Department Of Health Services
Department Of Public Safety
Duties
Facility Surveyors
Fingerprint Clearance Cards
Fingerprinting
Fingerprinting Division
Fingerprints
Funds
Information Technology
Powers And Duties
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Repeal
State Government - Title 41
Vital Records
Vital Records Systems
Welfare - Title 46
Background Check Requirements
Central State Repository
Child Care
Child Care Group Homes
Child Care Personnel
Child Care Providers
Day Care Homes
Definitions
Department Of Economic Security
Department Of Health Services
Department Of Public Safety
Duties
Facility Surveyors
Fingerprint Clearance Cards
Fingerprinting
Fingerprinting Division
Fingerprints
Funds
Information Technology
Powers And Duties
Public Health And Safety - Title 36
Repeal
State Government - Title 41
Vital Records
Vital Records Systems
Welfare - Title 46
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 113 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 883.02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
36 | 897.03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1750 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1758 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1758.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1964 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 1967.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
41 | 619.51 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
46 | 811 | New Code | See Bill Text |