AZ SB1532 | 2019 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 1st Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - House APPROP Committee action: Discussed and Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Failed on March 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - House APPROP Committee action: Discussed and Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriations; felony pretrial intervention programs
Title
Appropriations; felony pretrial intervention programs
Sponsors
Sen. Kate Brophy McGee [R] | Sen. Sylvia Allen [R] | Rep. Heather Carter [R] | Rep. John Allen [R] |
Rep. Noel Campbell [R] | Rep. Jeff Weninger [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - House - House Appropriations Committee Action (DISC/HELD) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-20 - House - House Judiciary Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 6 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Committee Action (DP) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | House APPROP Committee action: Discussed and Held, voting: (0-0-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-20 | House | House JUD Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (6-4-0-0-0-0) |
2019-03-13 | House | House read second time |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to House APPROP Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Assigned to House JUD Committee |
2019-03-12 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2019-02-28 | House | Transmit to House |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-4-0-0) |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate consent calendar |
2019-02-25 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Senate APPROP Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (9-0-0-0) |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Assigned to Senate APPROP Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |