AZ SB1557 | 2020 | Fifty-fourth Legislature 2nd Regular
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Chapter 90
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-05 - Chapter 90
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Annuity transactions; requirements
Title
Annuity transactions; requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-05-19 - House - House - Third Reading (Y: 36 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - House - House Rules Committee Action (C&P) (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-02 - House - House Regulatory Affairs Committee Action (DP) (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - Senate - Senate - Third Reading (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-19 - Senate - Senate - Committee of the Whole (DPA) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-17 - Senate - Senate Rules Committee Action (PFC) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-12 - Senate - Senate Finance Committee Action (DPA) (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-05 | Senate | Chapter 90 |
2020-06-05 | Senate | Governor Signed |
2020-05-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-05-19 | Senate | Transmit to Senate |
2020-05-19 | House | House third reading PASSED voting: (36-24-0-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | House minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-10 | House | House majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-03-09 | House | House consent calendar |
2020-03-09 | House | House RULES Committee action: constitutional and in proper form, voting: (8-0-0-0-0-0) |
2020-03-02 | House | House RA Committee action: Do Pass, voting: (5-2-0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-26 | House | House read second time |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RULES Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Assigned to House RA Committee |
2020-02-25 | House | Introduced in House and read first time |
2020-02-20 | House | Transmit to House |
2020-02-20 | Senate | Senate third reading PASSED voting: (26-0-4-0) |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Senate Committee of the Whole action: Do Pass Amended |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate majority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Senate minority caucus: Do pass |
2020-02-17 | Senate | Senate RULES Committee action: Proper For Consideration, voting: (0-0-0-0) |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Senate FIN Committee action: Do Pass Amended, voting: (9-0-1-0) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Senate read second time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate RULES Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Assigned to Senate FIN Committee |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced in Senate and read first time |
Subjects
Annuities
Annuity Training
Annuity Transaction
Compliance
Continuing Education
Courses
Definitions
Delayed Repeal
Duties Of Insurers And Producers
Effective Date
Enforcement
Insurance
Insurance - Title 20
Insurance Producers
Penalties
Producer Training
Recordkeeping
Repeal
Requirements
Scope And Limitation Of Article
Annuity Training
Annuity Transaction
Compliance
Continuing Education
Courses
Definitions
Delayed Repeal
Duties Of Insurers And Producers
Effective Date
Enforcement
Insurance
Insurance - Title 20
Insurance Producers
Penalties
Producer Training
Recordkeeping
Repeal
Requirements
Scope And Limitation Of Article
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 1243 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1243.01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1243.03 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1243.05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1243.06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1243.07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |